TX SB1621 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Passed to 3rd reading as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to creating a license for certain rural medical facilities; requiring a license; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to creating a license for certain rural medical facilities; requiring a license; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseAmended 2-Price
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Price
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably as amended
2019-05-13HouseAmendment(s) considered in committee
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseMeeting cancelled
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-02SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-06SenateFiled
2019-03-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback