TX SB1620 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-21 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of raising or keeping six or fewer chickens by a political subdivision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of raising or keeping six or fewer chickens by a political subdivision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-21HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-04-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-05SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenatePassed
2017-04-05SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-05SenateRecord vote
2017-04-05SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-05SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-05SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-05SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-03-29SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-03-21SenateRead first time
2017-03-09SenateFiled
2017-03-09SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback