TX SB1605 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the availability of certain school district financial information on certain districts' Internet websites.
Title
Relating to the availability of certain school district financial information on certain districts' Internet websites.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Passed (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |