TX SB160 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Status: Introduced on November 10 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Summary
Relating to the Texas Holocaust and Genocide Commission.
Title
Relating to the Texas Holocaust and Genocide Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-10 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-02-10 | Read first time | |
2009-01-26 | Co-author authorized | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB795 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
SB482 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
SB482 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HOLOCAUST & GENOCIDE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Human Relations
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
HOLOCAUST & GENOCIDE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Human Relations
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed