TX SB1599 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to disclosures regarding indemnification obligations and insurance coverage in connection with provision of services pertaining to wells or mines by certain subcontractors.
Title
Relating to disclosures regarding indemnification obligations and insurance coverage in connection with provision of services pertaining to wells or mines by certain subcontractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3416 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Insurance
Insurance--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
WATER
Water--General
CONTRACTORS & SUBCONTRACTORS
Insurance
Insurance--General
Mines & Mineral Resources
Oil & Gas
WATER
Water--General