TX SB1589 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-15 - Effective on 1/1/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for reporting unclaimed mineral proceeds to the comptroller of public accounts.
Title
Relating to requirements for reporting unclaimed mineral proceeds to the comptroller of public accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - SB 1589Third Reading House (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-15 | Effective on 1/1/16 | |
2015-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-22 | House | Passed |
2015-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-07 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to Energy Resources |
2015-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Mines & Mineral Resources
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
ROYALTIES
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY
Mines & Mineral Resources
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
ROYALTIES
UNCLAIMED PROPERTY