TX SB1588 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the powers and duties of certain property owners' associations.
Title
Relating to the powers and duties of certain property owners' associations.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] | Rep. Chris Turner [D] | Rep. Greg Bonnen [R] |
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Hugh Shine [R] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] |
Rep. Sheryl Cole [D] | Rep. David Cook [R] | Rep. Jay Dean [R] | Rep. Jake Ellzey [R] |
Rep. Art Fierro [D] | Rep. Vikki Goodwin [D] | Rep. Cody Harris [R] | Rep. Justin Holland [R] |
Rep. Celia Israel [D] | Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Rep. Tracy King [D] | Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] |
Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. Glenn Rogers [R] | Rep. David Spiller [R] | Rep. Ed Thompson [R] |
Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Erin Zwiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1731 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Amended RV#1270 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Amended RV#1260 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1731 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Amended RV#1270 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - Amended RV#1260 (Y: 142 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | See remarks for effective date | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1731 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2021-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1270 |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed as amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 3-Davis |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 2-Stephenson |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 1-C. Turner |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | House | Record vote RV#1260 |
2021-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 7-Toth |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 6-Schofield |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 5-Bonnen |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 4-J.D. Johnson |
2021-05-19 | House | Amended 3-Goodwin |
2021-05-19 | House | Amendment adopted as amended 1-C. Turner |
2021-05-19 | House | Amendment amended 2-Huberty |
2021-05-19 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-C. Turner |
2021-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-19 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2021-05-11 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 3367 |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to Business & Industry |
2021-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amended |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3367 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 1588
HB3367 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 1588
HB3367 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 1588