TX SB1588 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the elimination of regular mandatory vehicle safety inspections and the imposition of replacement fees.
Title
Relating to the elimination of regular mandatory vehicle safety inspections and the imposition of replacement fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEAT BELTS
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEAT BELTS
VEHICLE EMISSIONS
VEHICLE INSPECTIONS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Equipment
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration