TX SB1587 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to lead in drinking water at public schools.
Title
Relating to lead in drinking water at public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Day Care
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEAD POISONING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
WATER
Water--General
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LEAD POISONING
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
WATER
Water--General