TX SB1586 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a shared database for deer breeder reporting requirements.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a shared database for deer breeder reporting requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-07 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | |
2009-05-07 | Read first time | |
2009-05-01 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Amended | |
2009-04-30 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-30 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-30 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-10 | Filed | |
2009-03-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3560 (Same As) 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
ANIMAL HEALTH COMMISSION, TEXAS
Animals
Electronic Information Systems
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General
Animals
Electronic Information Systems
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE, DEPARTMENT OF
Parks & Wildlife--General