TX SB1584 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the validation of the dissolution of the Development Corporation of Presidio and the creation of the Presidio Municipal Development District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the validation of the dissolution of the Development Corporation of Presidio and the creation of the Presidio Municipal Development District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-17 - House - SB 1584Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-20SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-17HouseRecord vote
2013-05-17HousePassed
2013-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-17HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-05-16HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-05-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-17HouseReferred to Special Purpose Districts
2013-04-17HouseRead first time
2013-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-16SenateRecord vote
2013-04-16SenatePassed
2013-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-16SenateRecord vote
2013-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-19SenateReferred to Economic Development
2013-03-19SenateRead first time
2013-03-08SenateFiled
2013-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback