TX SB1582 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to benefits for peace officers relating to certain diseases or illnesses.
Title
Relating to benefits for peace officers relating to certain diseases or illnesses.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Lucio [D] | Rep. John Wray [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Terry Canales [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amended RV#1373 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amended RV#1373 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1373 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Wray |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-13 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Dutton |
2019-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-13 | House | Postponed 5/13/19 2:43 PM |
2019-05-13 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Dutton |
2019-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1492 (Similar To) 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS