TX SB1578 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of opinions from medical professionals in making certain determinations relating to the abuse or neglect of a child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of opinions from medical professionals in making certain determinations relating to the abuse or neglect of a child.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Record vote RV#1312 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1311 (Y: 66 N: 79 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-23HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1312
2021-05-23HousePassed
2021-05-23HouseRecord vote RV#1311
2021-05-23HouseAmendment fails of adoption 1-Klick
2021-05-23HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-20HouseAmendment adopted as amended 2-Klick, et al.
2021-05-20HouseAmendment amended 3-Klick
2021-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Klick, Rose, Meza, Hull, A. Johnson, Raymond, Noble, Neave, and Wu
2021-05-20HouseAmended 1-Frank
2021-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1578
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01578I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01578S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01578E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01578H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01578F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01578H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01578H22.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01578H23.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01578H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01578I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01578I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01578H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01578F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01578F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F1.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1578&RcdVtNo=1311&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1578&RcdVtNo=1312&Ch=H&Dt=05/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=113

Bill Comments

feedback