TX SB1576 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the civil commitment of sexually violent predators, the operation of the Texas Civil Commitment Office, and certain related offenses; increasing a criminal penalty.
Title
Relating to the civil commitment of sexually violent predators, the operation of the Texas Civil Commitment Office, and certain related offenses; increasing a criminal penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#735 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-08 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-08 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2017-05-01 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CIVIL COMMITMENT
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TEXAS CIVIL COMMITMENT OFFICE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Crimes--Capital Punishment
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Bail & Pretrial Release
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL OFFENDERS
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
TEXAS CIVIL COMMITMENT OFFICE
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses