TX SB1572 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the numbering and signing of ballots by early voting clerks and deputy early voting clerks.
Title
Relating to the numbering and signing of ballots by early voting clerks and deputy early voting clerks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - FA1 Hall (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - FA1 Hall (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-17 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-05-17 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amended |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hall |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |