TX SB1565 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requiring the establishment of policy frameworks for research security at public institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to requiring the establishment of policy frameworks for research security at public institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Angela Paxton [R] | Sen. Drew Springer [R] |
Rep. Dennis Paul [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#2039 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2039 |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2023-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported from s/c favorably with substitute |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered by subcommittee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |