TX SB1561 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study by the State Board of Education on the instructional day and academic year requirements necessary to complete the required curriculum in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study by the State Board of Education on the instructional day and academic year requirements necessary to complete the required curriculum in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-16HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-05-16HouseRead first time
2017-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-15SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenatePassed
2017-05-15SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-15SenateRecord vote
2017-05-15SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-15SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-15SenateAmended
2017-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-15SenateCo-author authorized
2017-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-09SenateReported favorably as amended
2017-05-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Education
2017-03-21SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback