TX SB1544 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]


Relating to financial reporting requirements of regional planning commissions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relating to financial reporting requirements of regional planning commissions.


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-17HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2017-05-15HouseReferred to County Affairs
2017-05-15HouseRead first time
2017-04-20HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-04-19SenateReported engrossed
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-19SenateRecord vote
2017-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-04-19SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-04-19SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-04-19SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-03-30SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-03-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-03-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-21SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2017-03-21SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate


Texas State Sources

Bill Comments