TX SB1536 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-08 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the public school finance system.
Title
Relating to the public school finance system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3837 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Referred to Public Education
HB1525 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - See remarks for effective date
HB1525 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - See remarks for effective date
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS