TX SB1536 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
Status: Introduced on March 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-05 - Committee report printed and distributed
Summary
Relating to preferred drug lists adopted by the Health and Human Services Commission and associated requirements regarding supplemental rebates, prior authorization, and public notification.
Title
Relating to preferred drug lists adopted by the Health and Human Services Commission and associated requirements regarding supplemental rebates, prior authorization, and public notification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3719 (Similar To) 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Subjects
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
INTERNET
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
INTERNET
MEDICINE & PRESCRIPTION DRUGS