TX SB1532 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-23 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain occupations and activities; authorizing fees.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain occupations and activities; authorizing fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2847 (Similar To) 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
AUDIOLOGISTS
BOILERS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
DIETETICS & DIETITIANS
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Insurance
Insurance--General
Labor
Labor--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOLD & MOLD REMEDIATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ORTHOTICS & ORTHOTISTS
PROSTHETISTS & PROSTHETICS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General
BOILERS
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Business & Commerce--Trade Practices
Consumer Protection
DIETETICS & DIETITIANS
DRIVER EDUCATION & SAFETY CLASSES
Education
Education--Driver Education & Training
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Insurance
Insurance--General
Labor
Labor--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MOLD & MOLD REMEDIATION
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
ORTHOTICS & ORTHOTISTS
PROSTHETISTS & PROSTHETICS
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--General