TX SB1530 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of mediation requirements for balance billing to certain health benefit plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of mediation requirements for balance billing to certain health benefit plans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseCorrected committee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCorrected comm. report distributed
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-16HouseCorrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Insurance
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenatePassed
2019-04-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3299 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback