TX SB1530 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to including playgrounds in the designation of certain places as drug-free zones for purposes of the criminal penalties that apply to certain drug-related offenses.
Title
Relating to including playgrounds in the designation of certain places as drug-free zones for purposes of the criminal penalties that apply to certain drug-related offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Passed | |
2009-05-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-07 | Record vote | |
2009-05-07 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-07 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-07 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-07 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-27 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-27 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-23 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-21 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-09 | Filed | |
2009-03-09 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2466 (Same As) 2009-05-19 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PLAYGROUNDS & PLAYGROUND SAFETY
Crimes--Drugs
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
PLAYGROUNDS & PLAYGROUND SAFETY