TX SB1529 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Texas Court of Appeals to hear certain cases; authorizing fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Texas Court of Appeals to hear certain cases; authorizing fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseWithdrawn from schedule
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-20HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-20HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-14SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13SenateAmended
2021-04-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Huffman
2021-04-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-13SenateAmended
2021-04-13SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2021-04-13SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-13SenateRecord vote
2021-04-13SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-01SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1529
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01529I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01529S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01529E.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01529S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01529S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01529I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01529I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01529S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01529S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01529E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-13-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=7

Bill Comments 750

feedback