TX SB1525 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the application of the sales and use tax to certain property and services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the application of the sales and use tax to certain property and services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1556 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1556
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-05-01HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-17SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Finance
2019-03-14SenateRead first time
2019-03-05SenateFiled
2019-03-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3787 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback