TX SB1523 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the adoption of the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act of 2008.
Title
Relating to the adoption of the Uniform Interstate Family Support Act of 2008.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
Governor
UNIFORM INTERSTATE FAMILY SUPPORT ACT
Family
Family--Child Support
Family--Parent & Child
Governor
UNIFORM INTERSTATE FAMILY SUPPORT ACT