TX SB1512 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to Land & Resource Management
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the failure to disclose certain appraisal reports by an entity with eminent domain authority in connection with an offer to acquire real property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the failure to disclose certain appraisal reports by an entity with eminent domain authority in connection with an offer to acquire real property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-28HouseReferred to Land & Resource Management
2023-04-28HouseRead first time
2023-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2023-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2023-04-20SenateRecord vote
2023-04-20SenatePassed
2023-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2023-04-20SenateRecord vote
2023-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2023-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2023-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2023-04-20SenateLaid before the Senate
2023-04-20SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2023-04-12SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-04-12SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2023-04-12SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2023-04-06SenateVote taken in committee
2023-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-16SenateReferred to State Affairs
2023-03-16SenateRead first time
2023-03-03SenateFiled
2023-03-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback