TX SB1509 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-07 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to identification requirements for early voting by mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to identification requirements for early voting by mail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Elections
2021-05-04HouseRead first time
2021-04-29HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-28SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenatePassed
2021-04-28SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-28SenateRecord vote
2021-04-28SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-28SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-27SenateRecord vote
2021-04-27SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-27SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-26SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-22SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-22SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-11SenateFiled
2021-03-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1509
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01509I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01509S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01509E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01509I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01509I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01509S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01509S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01509E.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-27-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-28-F.PDF#page=34

Bill Comments 750

feedback