TX SB1508 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-04 - Referred to Elections
Pending: House Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of the election integrity division in the office of the attorney general.
Title
Relating to the establishment of the election integrity division in the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Elections |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Elections
Elections--General
Law Enforcement
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
SUBPOENAS
Elections
Elections--General
Law Enforcement
Political Subdivisions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
SUBPOENAS