TX SB15 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 24-7)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the Texas Consumer Privacy Act Phase I; creating criminal offenses; increasing the punishment for an existing criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Texas Consumer Privacy Act Phase I; creating criminal offenses; increasing the punishment for an existing criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1768 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Amended RV#1423 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1768
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts resolution to go outside bounds HR 1997
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts resolution to go outside bounds SR545
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-27SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-27SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1423
2021-05-25HousePassed as amended
2021-05-25HouseAmended 1-J. Turner
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-P. King
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-13HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-11HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-11HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-19HouseRead first time
2021-04-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-14SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-14SenateRemarks ordered printed
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenatePassed
2021-04-14SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-14SenateRecord vote
2021-04-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-04-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14SenateAmended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Nichols
2021-04-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-14SenateAmended
2021-04-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Nichols
2021-04-14SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-12SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-31SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-29SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-09SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2021-03-02SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-01SenateFiled
2021-03-01SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3471 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB15
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00015I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00015S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00015E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00015H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00015F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00015S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00015S2F2.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00015H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00015H31.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00015I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00015I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00015S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00015S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00015E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00015H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00015H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00015F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-14-F.PDF#page=18
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB15&RcdVtNo=1423&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB15&RcdVtNo=1768&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=21

Bill Comments 750

feedback