TX SB15 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition against certain local regulation of private employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition against certain local regulation of private employers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-12SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-04SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-25SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-25SenateRereferred to committee
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-02-12SenateFiled
2019-02-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1654 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback