TX SB1499 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-07 - Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the municipal disannexation of certain areas formerly designated as a census designated place.
Title
Relating to the municipal disannexation of certain areas formerly designated as a census designated place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Amendment to amendment fails of adoption (Y: 13 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-07 | House | Point of order sustained Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2021-05-07 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2021-05-06 | House | Postponed 5/6/21 11:00 PM |
2021-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-06 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion HB 3827 |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2021-04-30 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amended FA1 Buckingham |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment to amendment fails of adoption |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered FA2 Eckhardt |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Buckingham |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3827 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Companion considered in lieu of SB 1499
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Annexation
City Government--Utilities
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER & SEWER SERVICE
City Government--Annexation
City Government--Utilities
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Utilities
Utilities--Water & Sewer
WATER & SEWER SERVICE