TX SB1494 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the educational needs of homeless students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the educational needs of homeless students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-27 - House of Representatives - SB 1494Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective immediately
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-28SenateHouse passage reported
2015-05-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27HouseRecord vote
2015-05-27HousePassed
2015-05-27HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-27HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-27HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-27HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-26HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-05-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-05-22HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-05-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-21HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-05-21HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-05-21HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-20HousePosting rule suspended
2015-05-04HouseReferred to Public Education
2015-05-04HouseRead first time
2015-04-30HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-30SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-30SenateRecord vote
2015-04-30SenatePassed
2015-04-30SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-30SenateRecord vote
2015-04-30SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-30SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-30SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-30SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-04-30SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-04-30SenateCo-author authorized
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-16SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-04-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Education
2015-03-19SenateRead first time
2015-03-12SenateFiled
2015-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback