TX SB1490 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-08 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to authorize certain degree programs offered by private postsecondary educational institutions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board to authorize certain degree programs offered by private postsecondary educational institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-08 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-29HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1223
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-12HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-07HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Higher Education
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenatePassed
2021-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-14SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-07SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-31SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-31SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-31SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Higher Education
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3848 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Referred to Higher Education
HB3848 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Referred to Higher Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1490
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01490I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01490S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01490E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01490H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01490F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01490I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01490I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01490S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01490S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01490E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01490H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01490H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01490F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-20-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1490&RcdVtNo=1223&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=79

Bill Comments 750

feedback