TX SB149 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities.
Title
Relating to the prosecution of the offense of operation of an unmanned aircraft over certain facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1536 (Y: 138 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House passage reported |
2021-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1536 |
2021-05-26 | House | Passed |
2021-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Aeronautics
AIRPORTS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Military & Veterans
AIRPORTS
Crimes
Crimes--Miscellaneous
Electronic Information Systems
Law Enforcement
Military & Veterans