TX SB149 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to alternative methods for satisfying certain public high school graduation requirements, including the use of individual graduation committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to alternative methods for satisfying certain public high school graduation requirements, including the use of individual graduation committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - House - SB 149Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-11 Effective immediately
2015-05-11 Signed by the Governor
2015-04-30 Sent to the Governor
2015-04-30HouseSigned in the House
2015-04-30HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-04-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-04-30SenateReported enrolled
2015-04-29SenateRecord vote
2015-04-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-04-29SenateRead
2015-04-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-04-23SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-04-22HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-22HouseRecord vote
2015-04-22HousePassed as amended
2015-04-22HouseAmended
2015-04-22HouseAmended
2015-04-22HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-21HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2015-04-21HouseAmended
2015-04-21HouseAmended
2015-04-21HouseAmended
2015-04-21HouseAmended
2015-04-21HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-16HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-04-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-07HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-07HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-04-02HouseReferred to Public Education
2015-04-02HouseRead first time
2015-03-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-03-17SenateReported engrossed
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenatePassed
2015-03-17SenateRead 3rd time
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-03-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-17SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-03-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-17SenateAmended
2015-03-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-03-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-17SenateAmended
2015-03-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-03-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-17SenateAmended
2015-03-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-03-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-17SenateAmended
2015-03-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2015-03-17SenateRead 2nd time
2015-03-17SenateRecord vote
2015-03-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-03-17SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-03-16SenateCo-author authorized
2015-03-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-03-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-03-04SenatePosting rule suspended
2015-02-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-02-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-02-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-02-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-01-27SenateReferred to Education
2015-01-27SenateRead first time
2014-11-10SenateFiled
2014-11-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback