TX SB1484 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of an instructional materials web portal by the commissioner of education.
Title
Relating to the creation of an instructional materials web portal by the commissioner of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-24 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-15 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPETITIVE BIDDING
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Textbooks
Education--School Districts
Electronic Information Systems