TX SB1476 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the veteran entrepreneur program by the Texas Veterans Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the veteran entrepreneur program by the Texas Veterans Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-15SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-15SenateHouse passage reported
2013-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-15HouseRecord vote
2013-05-15HousePassed
2013-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2013-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-30HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-30HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-04-30HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2013-05-02HouseMeeting cancelled
2013-05-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-24HouseReferred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
2013-04-24HouseRead first time
2013-04-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-18SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-18SenateRecord vote
2013-04-18SenatePassed
2013-04-18SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-18SenateRecord vote
2013-04-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2013-04-18SenateCo-author authorized
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-10SenateNo action taken in committee
2013-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2013-04-03SenateNo action taken in committee
2013-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-20SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-03-20SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-03-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-20SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-18SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
2013-03-18SenateRead first time
2013-03-07SenateFiled
2013-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback