TX SB1474 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-06 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-06 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to special education in public schools, including the special education allotment under the Foundation School Program, an education savings account program for certain children with disabilities, and a grant program to reimburse public schools for the cost of certain employer contributions for retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas employed to teach or provide services related to special education.
Title
Relating to special education in public schools, including the special education allotment under the Foundation School Program, an education savings account program for certain children with disabilities, and a grant program to reimburse public schools for the cost of certain employer contributions for retirees of the Teacher Retirement System of Texas employed to teach or provide services related to special education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2023-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BLIND & VISUALLY IMPAIRED, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
VIDEO CAMERAS
CRIMINAL RECORDS
DEAF, TEXAS SCHOOL FOR THE
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Private
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
VIDEO CAMERAS