TX SB1474 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the I-27 Advisory Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the I-27 Advisory Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1223 (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HouseRecord vote RV#1223
2021-05-18HousePassed
2021-05-18HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-18HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-13HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-12HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-04-26HouseRead first time
2021-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenatePassed
2021-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-23SenateRecord vote
2021-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-23SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-19SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-19SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Transportation
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-22SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3675 (Same As) 2021-04-06 - Withdrawn from schedule

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1474
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01474I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01474S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01474E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01474H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01474F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01474I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01474I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01474S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01474S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01474E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01474H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01474F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-23-F.PDF#page=4
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1474&RcdVtNo=1223&Ch=H&Dt=05/18/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-23-F.PDF#page=4

Bill Comments 750

feedback