TX SB1474 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to compensation for certain emergency services personnel.
Title
Relating to compensation for certain emergency services personnel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-16 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-03-25 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-25 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2009-03-17 | Read first time | |
2009-03-06 | Filed | |
2009-03-06 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
COMPENSATORY TIME
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
EMPLOYEE BENEFITS & LEAVE
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Law Enforcement
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees