TX SB1462 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the prescription, administration, and possession of certain opioid antagonists for the treatment of suspected opioid overdoses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the prescription, administration, and possession of certain opioid antagonists for the treatment of suspected opioid overdoses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-26 - House - SB 1462Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Effective on 9/1/15
2015-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2015-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29SenateRecord vote
2015-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2015-05-29SenateRead
2015-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2015-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2015-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26HouseRecord vote
2015-05-26HousePassed
2015-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2015-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-05-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-05-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-05-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-05-19HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-05-19HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-05-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-05-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-19HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-01HouseReferred to Public Health
2015-05-01HouseRead first time
2015-04-22HouseReceived from the Senate
2015-04-22SenateReported engrossed
2015-04-22SenateRecord vote
2015-04-22SenatePassed
2015-04-22SenateRead 3rd time
2015-04-22SenateRecord vote
2015-04-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-04-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-04-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2015-04-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2015-04-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2015-04-16SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-04-16SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-04-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-19SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2015-03-19SenateRead first time
2015-03-12SenateFiled
2015-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback