TX SB1458 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to standardized forms and materials for the issuance of protective orders, magistrate's orders for emergency protection, and temporary ex parte orders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to standardized forms and materials for the issuance of protective orders, magistrate's orders for emergency protection, and temporary ex parte orders.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-29 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1500 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Vetoed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-29HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-29SenateRecord vote
2021-05-29SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-29SenateRead
2021-05-29SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1500
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-26HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-26HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-26HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-23HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-05-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-05HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-05HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-05HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-30HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2021-04-30HouseRead first time
2021-04-27HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenatePassed
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-26SenateRecord vote
2021-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Jurisprudence
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1458
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01458I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01458S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01458E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01458H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01458F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01458I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01458I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01458S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01458S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01458E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01458H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01458H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01458F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-26-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1458&RcdVtNo=1500&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-29-F.PDF#page=64

Bill Comments

feedback