TX SB1450 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulatory authority of the commissioner of insurance and the Texas Department of Insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulatory authority of the commissioner of insurance and the Texas Department of Insurance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-28 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#2040 (Y: 99 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - Rules suspended RV#2039 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1758 (Y: 132 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - RV#1757 (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - 1-G. Bonnen RV#1756 (Y: 139 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-12 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-30 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-30HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-29SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-29HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-29SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2017-05-28SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2017-05-28HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2017-05-28HouseRecord vote
2017-05-28HouseRules suspended
2017-05-28House1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
2017-05-28HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2017-05-28SenateRecord vote
2017-05-28SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2017-05-27HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2017-05-27SenateConference committee report filed
2017-05-27SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-27SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2017-05-27HouseHouse appoints conferees
2017-05-27HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2017-05-26HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2017-05-26HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2017-05-26SenateSenate appoints conferees
2017-05-26SenateSenate requests conference committee
2017-05-26SenateSenate refuses to concur
2017-05-26SenateRead
2017-05-26SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2017-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HousePassed as amended
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-24HouseRecord vote
2017-05-24HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2017-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-21HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-05-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-05-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Insurance
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-24SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-20SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-20SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2017-03-20SenateRead first time
2017-03-08SenateFiled
2017-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01450I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01450S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01450E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01450H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/SB01450F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-04-F1.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450&RcdVtNo=1710&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450&RcdVtNo=1756&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450&RcdVtNo=1757&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450&RcdVtNo=1758&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450&RcdVtNo=2039&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=SB1450&RcdVtNo=2040&Ch=H&Dt=05/28/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-28-F.PDF#page=66

Bill Comments

feedback