TX SB1445 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to simplified certification and recertification requirements for certain persons under the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Rep. Terry Meza [D] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2019-04-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-25 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3524 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Human Services