TX SB1444 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to participation in the uniform group coverage program for active school employees and to a study concerning health coverage for school district employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to participation in the uniform group coverage program for active school employees and to a study concerning health coverage for school district employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1395 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1395
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-23HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-07HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-05-07HouseRead first time
2021-05-06HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-06SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-06SenateRecord vote
2021-05-06SenatePassed
2021-05-06SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-06SenateRecord vote
2021-05-06SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-06SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-06SenateAmended
2021-05-06SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2021-05-06SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-06SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-22SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-22SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-22SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-22SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-24SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4078 (Same As) 2021-05-11 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1444
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01444I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01444S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01444E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01444H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01444F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB01444S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01444I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01444I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01444S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01444S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB01444E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01444H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB01444F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-06-F.PDF#page=21
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1444&RcdVtNo=1395&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021

Bill Comments

feedback