TX SB1441 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment or order on appeal.
Title
Relating to the right of certain appellants to supersede a judgment or order on appeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |