TX SB1427 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing an insurer's deposit of certain money and other assets with the Texas Department of Insurance.
Title
Relating to authorizing an insurer's deposit of certain money and other assets with the Texas Department of Insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - House - SB 1427Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed |
2015-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-13 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-12 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-12 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-12 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2015-05-11 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-08 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |