TX SB142 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 11 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-22 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to zero-based budgeting for state agencies as a part of the sunset review process.
Title
Relating to zero-based budgeting for state agencies as a part of the sunset review process.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Left pending in subcommittee |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Filed |
2012-12-11 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Governor
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Review Procedures
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Legislature
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
Sunset
SUNSET ADVISORY COMMISSION
Sunset--Review Procedures
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=83R&Bill=SB142 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/83R/billtext/html/SB00142I.htm |