TX SB1412 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-24 - Referred to Ways & Means
Pending: House Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the adoption and repeal of an additional ad valorem road tax for the maintenance of county roads.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the adoption and repeal of an additional ad valorem road tax for the maintenance of county roads.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-05-24HouseRead first time
2021-05-19HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenatePassed
2021-05-18SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-18SenateRecord vote
2021-05-18SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-05-18SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-18SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-18SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-03-18SenateRead first time
2021-03-10SenateFiled
2021-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4142 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB4142 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback